This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/26/2021 at 13:58:38 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. RYALS, WILLIE B

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RYALS, WILLIE B. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHWAB, CHARLES A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********57 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

RYALS, WILLIE BARRINGTON

RYALS, WILLIE B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORMIER, JUSTIN

Defendant Attorney

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

2/9/2021: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

2/5/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

12/17/2020: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/9/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

11/20/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/13/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/13/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

11/12/2020: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

11/10/2020: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

11/10/2020: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

11/9/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

9/21/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

9/29/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION ( V )

9/29/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

9/21/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

9/21/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SCHMIDT, DENNIS - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002257 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. RYALS, WILLIE B - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-2/5/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 03/02/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY DEFENSE MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DOCKET CALL: DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT IN OPEN COURT. APD T.HOGAN AND ASA J.CORMIER WAS PRESENT VIA ZOOM, DEFENSE MADE A MOTION TO CONTINUE. MOTION GRANTED. CASE SET FOR DOCKET CALL ON 03/02/21 AT 9:00AM . KA/KD/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2020
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount; Code: PDAPP; Description: Public Defender Application; Assessment: $50.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SCHMIDT, DENNIS - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002257 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. RYALS, WILLIE B - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-12/9/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 11/09/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: CORMIER, JUSTIN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND 2020AA025911 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002257 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA