Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 07:56:26 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. RUSSELL, GAVIN

Case Summary

On 08/07/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RUSSELL, GAVIN. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ISENHOWER, DARYL and NELSON, KATHRYN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********30 A

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ISENHOWER, DARYL

NELSON, KATHRYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RUSSELL, GAVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALFORD, JONATHON RAY

STROKE, LINDSAY CHRISTINA

Defendant Attorneys

WALSH, HAROLD CHRISTOPHER III

SHOWE, JORDAN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT NOTICE SENT

1/30/2019: DEFAULT PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT NOTICE SENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

6/15/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4134.2169 / 4437913) ( V )

5/21/2018: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4134.2169 / 4437913) ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

5/14/2018: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

3/22/2018: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

2/9/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

2/8/2018: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

PLEA OF DENIAL ( V )

2/8/2018: PLEA OF DENIAL ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

2/8/2018: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

2/2/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION - Recorded (Other.4055.1887 / 4362397) ( V )

10/20/2017: ORDER OF PROBATION - Recorded (Other.4055.1887 / 4362397) ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

10/2/2017: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

PLEA AGREEMENT

9/25/2017: PLEA AGREEMENT

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

9/25/2017: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

8/29/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

8/25/2017: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

8/25/2017: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

INFORMATION ( V )

8/24/2017: INFORMATION ( V )

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney JONATHON RAY ALFORD - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000053650; Applied Amount; $23.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $23.00 RECEIPT #2019000053650

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000036196; Applied Amount; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019000036196

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000028017; Applied Amount; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019000028017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000018286; Applied Amount; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019000018286

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000009468; Applied Amount; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STROKE, LINDSAY CHRISTINA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 08/29/2017 AT 9:30 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketSURETY BOND X60333964 POSTED $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE NELSON, KATHRYN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/07/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017MM002030 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALFORD, JONATHON RAY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STROKE, LINDSAY CHRISTINA