This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/24/2020 at 17:45:38 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ROGERS, DAVID LEE

Case Summary

On 01/02/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROGERS, DAVID LEE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********01 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ROGERS, DAVID LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

OHLE, MICHAEL ROBERT

COUZENS, STEVEN EDWARD

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION ( V )

6/27/2018: NO INFORMATION ( V )

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

6/12/2018: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

6/6/2018: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

6/1/2018: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

5/30/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - INSUFFICIENT INFORMATION SECTION 3 AND 4 INCOMPLETE ( V )

5/25/2018: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - INSUFFICIENT INFORMATION SECTION 3 AND 4 INCOMPLETE ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

5/25/2018: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

5/24/2018: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

5/24/2018: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

5/24/2018: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

5/24/2018: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

5/24/2018: WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

EXTRADITION COST MEMO ( V )

5/24/2018: EXTRADITION COST MEMO ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

4/25/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY ( V )

4/25/2018: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

4/25/2018: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

WARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

1/2/2018: WARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketREMOVED PUBLIC DEFENDER FEE PER F.S. 939.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 2; Description: FORGERY (831.01); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: UTTERING FORGED INSTRUMENT (831.02); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: OHLE, MICHAEL ROBERT - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2018CF000001 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. ROGERS, DAVID LEE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NIF-6/27/2018"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketLETTER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $90000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 1905620172571

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE LEVIN, STEVEN J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/02/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018CF000001 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less