Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/17/2021 at 03:17:04 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ROBINSON, JERMICHAEL ANDREAS

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROBINSON, JERMICHAEL ANDREAS. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********92 D

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ROBINSON, JERMICHAEL ANDREAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

4/13/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ORDER ( V )

4/13/2021: ORDER ( V )

MOTION TO SUPPRESS ( V )

3/29/2021: MOTION TO SUPPRESS ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/26/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION ( V ) ( V )

3/25/2021: INFORMATION ( V ) ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V ) ( V )

3/8/2021: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V ) ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V ) ( V )

3/8/2021: BOND RECEIVED ( V ) ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

3/8/2021: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DERTES, JOSHUA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CF000592 D, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. ROBINSON, JERMICHAEL ANDREAS - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-4/13/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 04/27/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: ROBY, WILLIAM L; SA19 - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CF000592 D, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. ROBINSON, JERMICHAEL ANDREAS - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: MS-3/29/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO SUPPRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DERTES, JOSHUA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CF000592 D, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. ROBINSON, JERMICHAEL ANDREAS - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-3/26/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE ROBY, WILLIAM L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/26/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF000592 D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSE15910130 POSTED $10,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/08/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF000599 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN