Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/17/2021 at 03:48:48 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ROBINSON, DANNY RENARD JR

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROBINSON, DANNY RENARD JR. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********92 E

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ROBINSON, DANNY RENARD JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN

Defendant Attorney

HOOPER, STEPHEN CHARLES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

4/7/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

4/7/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ORDER STRIKING MOTION ( V )

4/6/2021: ORDER STRIKING MOTION ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V )

4/5/2021: RETURN MAIL ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

3/31/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

3/31/2021: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V ) ( V )

3/15/2021: BOND RECEIVED ( V ) ( V )

WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V ) ( V )

3/12/2021: WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V ) ( V )

MOTION TO SUPPRESS ( V )

3/29/2021: MOTION TO SUPPRESS ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/26/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

TRANSFER CASE LETTER

3/26/2021: TRANSFER CASE LETTER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

3/24/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

3/18/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V ) ( V )

3/16/2021: ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V ) ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V ) ( V )

3/15/2021: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V ) ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V ) ( V )

3/12/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V ) ( V )

ARREST REPORT - NOT INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

3/12/2021: ARREST REPORT - NOT INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

WARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V ) ( V )

3/10/2021: WARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V ) ( V )

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: ZEIGLER, PATRICK - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CF000592 E, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. ROBINSON, DANNY RENARD JR - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-4/7/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 06/08/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SAO - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CF000592 E, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. ROBINSON, DANNY RENARD JR - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: EFORDSM-4/6/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: ZEIGLER, PATRICK - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CF000592 E, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. ROBINSON, DANNY RENARD JR - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-4/7/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 06/22/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCASE UNSECURED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $40000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 19056202116010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/10/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF000633 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN