Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/07/2021 at 04:24:38 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ROBINSON, DANNY RENARD JR

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROBINSON, DANNY RENARD JR. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHWAB, CHARLES A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********33 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

ROBINSON, DANNY RENARD

ROBINSON, DANNY RENARD JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN

Defendant Attorneys

KELLY, REBECCA

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

 

Court Documents

TRANSFER CASE LETTER

3/26/2021: TRANSFER CASE LETTER

INFORMATION ( V ) ( V )

3/25/2021: INFORMATION ( V ) ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

3/24/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

3/15/2021: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

3/18/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

3/16/2021: ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

3/15/2021: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

3/12/2021: WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

3/12/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

ARREST REPORT - NOT INITIATING CASE ( V )

3/12/2021: ARREST REPORT - NOT INITIATING CASE ( V )

WARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

3/10/2021: WARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED TO 2021CF000592 E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 2; Description: CARRYING CONCEALED FIREARM (790.01.2); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: POSSESSION FIREARM OR AMMUNITION BY CONVICTED FELON (790.23); Level: F; Degree: S; Disposition: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: KELLY, REBECCA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCASE UNSECURED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $40000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 19056202116010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/10/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF000633 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN