Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 06/05/2021 at 05:11:29 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. REYNOLDS EL, DISHAWN HAKEEM DARNELL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against REYNOLDS EL, DISHAWN HAKEEM DARNELL. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, KATHRYN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********81 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, KATHRYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

REYNOLDS EL, DISHAWN HAKEEM DARNELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SWEET, LAUREN KATHERYN

MILLER, JUSTIN THOMAS

Defendant Attorneys

MIRANDA, GINGER A

LEWIS, DAVID ALEXANDER

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

KELLY, REBECCA

COUZENS, STEVEN EDWARD

NELSON, JENNIFER A

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (Other.4613.66 / 4865669) ( V )

5/19/2021: CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (Other.4613.66 / 4865669) ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (Other.4612.2928 / 4865608) ( V )

5/19/2021: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (Other.4612.2928 / 4865608) ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

5/18/2021: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

4/16/2021: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

4/16/2021: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

4/12/2021: PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

10/8/2019: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

3/26/2019: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

10/7/2019: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

8/12/2019: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

FORFEITURE DISCHARGE NOTICE

8/5/2019: FORFEITURE DISCHARGE NOTICE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

4/30/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

4/9/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION ( V )

4/8/2019: INFORMATION ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

3/19/2019: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

3/19/2019: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

3/16/2019: NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

3/18/2019: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (Other.4613.66 / 4865669) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (Other.4612.2928 / 4865608) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: PDFEES MM; Description: Public Defender Fees; Assessment: $50.11; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: PDAPP; Description: Public Defender Application; Assessment: $50.11; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: COP MM; Description: Cost of Prosecution; Assessment: $100.20; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $100.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: COI; Description: Cost of Investigation; Assessment: $25.05; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $25.05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: MM COST; Description: MM Court Cost; Assessment: $223.45; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $223.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAttorney JENNIFER A NELSON - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC15204187 POSTED $7,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/18/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CF000762 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER, JUSTIN THOMAS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWEET, LAUREN KATHERYN