This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/26/2020 at 03:32:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. REFFORD, KATHRYN ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 05/17/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against REFFORD, KATHRYN ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********22 A

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

REFFORD, KATHRYN ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HOLBERTON, JESSICA JEAN

 

Court Documents

ORDER ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO WITHDRAW PLEA AND DISMISSING CHARGES ( V )

7/25/2019: ORDER ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO WITHDRAW PLEA AND DISMISSING CHARGES ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

6/27/2018: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

6/18/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

ORDER TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ( V )

6/12/2018: ORDER TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

6/11/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

IN-COURT NOTES

6/4/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

ORDER TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ( V )

5/31/2018: ORDER TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

5/17/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

5/17/2018: ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

5/17/2018: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

5/17/2018: NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

COURT MINUTES ( V )

5/17/2018: COURT MINUTES ( V )

CRIMINAL ACTIVITY REPORT ( V )

5/17/2018: CRIMINAL ACTIVITY REPORT ( V )

FINGERPRINTS ( V )

5/17/2018: FINGERPRINTS ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

5/17/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

TRANSFER IN SUPERVISION/JURISDICTION ( V )

5/17/2018: TRANSFER IN SUPERVISION/JURISDICTION ( V )

TRANSFER ORDER

5/17/2018: TRANSFER ORDER

INFORMATION ( V )

5/17/2018: INFORMATION ( V )

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • HearingEvent: DRUG COURT HEARING; Judge: LEVIN, STEVEN J; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: PLEA WITHDRAWN CHARGES DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO WITHDRAW PLEA AND DISMISSING CHARGES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketREOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DRUG COURT GRADUATION: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT. APD J. HOLBERTON AND ASA B. HARRISON WERE PRESENT. DEFENDANT'S FRIENDS FATHER WAS PRESENT. UPON SUCCESSFUL COMPLETION OF THE DRUG COURT PROGRAM, DEFENSE MADE A MOTION TO ALLOW THE DEFENDANT TO WITHDRAW PLEA AND DISMISS CHARGES. COURT GRANTED MOTION AND ENTERED AN ORDER. AP/CS/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketDRUG COURT HEARING SET FOR 07/25/2019 AT 1:45 PM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: LEVIN, STEVEN J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • HearingEvent: DRUG COURT HEARING; Judge: LEVIN, STEVEN J; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CASE HEARD / NEW COURT DATE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DRUG COURT HEARING: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT. CASE SET FOR ADDITIONAL REVIEW ON 07/25/2019 AT 1:45 PM. AP/KD/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketDRUG COURT HEARING SET FOR 07/11/2019 AT 1:45 PM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: LEVIN, STEVEN J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • HearingEvent: DRUG COURT HEARING; Judge: LEVIN, STEVEN J; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CASE HEARD / NEW COURT DATE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DRUG COURT HEARING: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT, ON "A" TEAM. DOING WELL. DEFENDANT PLACED ON HOTLINE TESTING. CASE SET FOR ADDITIONAL REVIEW ON 07/11/2019 AT 12:45 PM. DB/DS/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER IN SUPERVISION/JURISDICTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketLETTER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketDRUG COURT HEARING SET FOR 06/04/2018 AT 10:00 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: LEVIN, STEVEN J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE LEVIN, STEVEN J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/17/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018CF001322 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less