This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/23/2020 at 09:59:23 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. RAYMONVIL, PIERRE JR

Case Summary

On 08/18/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RAYMONVIL, PIERRE JR. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SWEET, GARY L and LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********73 A

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SWEET, GARY L

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RAYMONVIL, PIERRE JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORMIER, JUSTIN

Defendant Attorneys

ROSENBERG, REGAN M

COUZENS, STEVEN EDWARD

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF PROBATION(CORRECTED) ( V )

7/9/2018: ORDER OF PROBATION(CORRECTED) ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4148.1534 / 4450308) ( V )

6/22/2018: ORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4148.1534 / 4450308) ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

6/18/2018: ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

6/18/2018: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

6/14/2018: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

COMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL ( V )

6/14/2018: COMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL ( V )

PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

6/12/2018: PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

2/21/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/24/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/14/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

12/13/2017: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

11/8/2017: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/16/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

10/16/2017: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

10/12/2017: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

8/23/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION ( V )

8/22/2017: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

8/18/2017: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000015999; Applied Amount; $96.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $96.15 RECEIPT #2020000015999

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000082881; Applied Amount; $38.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $38.46 RECEIPT #2019000082881

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney REGAN M ROSENBERG - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney JUSTIN CORMIER - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION(CORRECTED) ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4155.2644 / 4457069) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION(CORRECTED) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4148.1534 / 4450308) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: CORMIER, JUSTIN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketSURETY BOND X60336791 POSTED $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketSURETY BOND X60336792 POSTED $3,750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketSURETY BOND X60336793 POSTED $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE LEVIN, STEVEN J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/18/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF002273 A

    Read MoreRead Less