Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 02:45:18 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. RAPP, PATRICIA ANN

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RAPP, PATRICIA ANN. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, KATHRYN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********42 A

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, KATHRYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RAPP, PATRICIA ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAKU, STEVEN RUSSELL

Defendant Attorney

HOOPER, STEPHEN CHARLES

 

Court Documents

PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT ( V )

2/10/2020: PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4375.1922 / 4667919) ( V )

1/29/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4375.1922 / 4667919) ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

1/24/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

NOTICE OF FINES AND COST DUE ( V )

1/14/2020: NOTICE OF FINES AND COST DUE ( V )

PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

1/14/2020: PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

1/14/2020: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

1/12/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

1/9/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

12/12/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/11/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

12/10/2019: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

12/9/2019: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

12/9/2019: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000045447; Applied Amount; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $30.00 RECEIPT #2020000045447

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000039368; Applied Amount; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $30.00 RECEIPT #2020000039368

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000032979; Applied Amount; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $30.00 RECEIPT #2020000032979

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000027622; Applied Amount; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $30.00 RECEIPT #2020000027622

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: PARTIAL PAY; Description: Partial Payment Fee; Assessment: $25.00; Paid: $25.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Plan / Judgment: Payment Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000018143; Applied Amount; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 01/14/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE NELSON, KATHRYN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/09/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019MM002842 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAKU, STEVEN RUSSELL