Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 06/04/2021 at 05:21:21 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. RAMIS, ROBERT SCOTT

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RAMIS, ROBERT SCOTT. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCHWAB, CHARLES A and MIRMAN, LAWRENCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********15 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RAMIS, ROBERT SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REID, KATY ELIZABETH

Defendant Attorney

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

5/12/2021: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

4/27/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

4/27/2021: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

4/27/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

4/23/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION ( V )

4/22/2021: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

4/13/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

4/5/2021: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

4/8/2021: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

4/8/2021: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

4/5/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: JOHNS-GROSE, LISA M - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CF000815 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. RAMIS, ROBERT SCOTT - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-4/27/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 07/13/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: JOHNS-GROSE, LISA M - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CF000815 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. RAMIS, ROBERT SCOTT - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-4/23/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND 2021AA021020 POSTED $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/05/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF000815 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REID, KATY ELIZABETH