This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/31/2021 at 05:09:15 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. RAINES, SHANE JOHN

Case Summary

On 02/15/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RAINES, SHANE JOHN. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHWAB, CHARLES A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********18 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RAINES, SHANE JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REID, KATY ELIZABETH

Defendant Attorney

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

 

Court Documents

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

2/15/2021: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: AGGRAVATED BATTERY-GREAT HARM (784.045.1A1); Level: F; Degree: S; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MEREUS, WILSON - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CF000418 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. RAINES, SHANE JOHN - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CDB-3/4/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC15947982 (784.045.1A1) RELEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: REID, KATY ELIZABETH ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNO INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC15947982 POSTED $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/15/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF000418 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REID, KATY ELIZABETH