This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/22/2020 at 10:43:12 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. QUINTANA, LUIS ALBERTO

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against QUINTANA, LUIS ALBERTO. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********76 B

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

QUINTANA, LUIS ALBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINN, MICHAEL JAMES

Defendant Attorneys

SCHAEFER, CHRISTINE ROLEKE

LEWIS, DAVID ALEXANDER

WILKINS, J RENEE

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4238.2917 / 4537469) ( V )

3/4/2019: CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4238.2917 / 4537469) ( V )

NOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

7/25/2018: NOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (Other.4146.562 / 4448090) ( V )

6/18/2018: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (Other.4146.562 / 4448090) ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

6/14/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

COMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL ( V )

6/14/2018: COMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

6/12/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

6/6/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

11/13/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/13/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ( V )

6/14/2017: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

6/13/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

ORDER APPT COUNSEL/CONFLICT COUNSEL/REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V )

6/6/2017: ORDER APPT COUNSEL/CONFLICT COUNSEL/REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

6/6/2017: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

5/15/2017: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

5/10/2017: INFORMATION ( V )

SEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V ) ( V )

4/21/2017: SEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V ) ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V ) ( V )

4/19/2017: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V ) ( V )

NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V ) ( V )

4/19/2017: NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V ) ( V )

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4238.2917 / 4537469) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCASE PLACED WITH LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON, LLP IN FILE SlcLGBSPlacements_08162018.txt - BALANCE DUE $525.94.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4147.1214 / 4449256) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (Other.4146.562 / 4448090) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • HearingEvent: CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING; Judge: LEVIN, STEVEN J; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CHANGE OF PLEA ENTERED / SENTENCE IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: LEVIN, STEVEN J; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXTRADITION COST MEMO ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE LEVIN, STEVEN J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/19/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF001077 A

    Read MoreRead Less