This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/23/2020 at 18:37:00 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. PRINCE, JOHNNIE

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PRINCE, JOHNNIE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHWAB, CHARLES A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********13 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PRINCE, JOHNNIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRAUN, GAYLE DELMAN

SWEET, LAUREN KATHERYN

Defendant Attorney

KELLY, REBECCA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

8/1/2019: NOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4252.109 / 4549802) ( V )

4/5/2019: CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4252.109 / 4549802) ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4251.2365 / 4549598) ( V )

4/4/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4251.2365 / 4549598) ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

4/2/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

3/26/2019: SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

IN-COURT NOTES

3/26/2019: IN-COURT NOTES

PLEA AGREEMENT

3/26/2019: PLEA AGREEMENT

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

3/12/2019: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

3/12/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED 2017CT001658 NOLLE PROS ( V )

1/28/2019: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED 2017CT001658 NOLLE PROS ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

1/28/2019: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

1/28/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

1/28/2019: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

CAPIAS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

1/18/2019: CAPIAS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

9/27/2017: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

9/26/2017: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

9/22/2017: CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

INFORMATION

9/22/2017: INFORMATION

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCASE PLACED WITH LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON, LLP IN FILE SlcLGBSPlacements_12052019.txt - BALANCE DUE $886.58.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney LAUREN KATHERYN SWEET - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED : PAY COSTS OR SETUP PAYMENT PLAN REQUIRED BY: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED 08/22/2019 - FAILED TO PAY $886.58

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - A6SXXRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A6SXXRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount; Code: PDAPP; Description: Public Defender Application; Assessment: $50.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/27/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF002613 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT, WITH APD PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN. ASA LINDSAY C. STROKE WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. FOFA. CASE UPFILED TO FELONYORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER CONTINUED FOR: DOCKET CALL. NEXT COURT DATE: 10/23/2017 09:00 AM WITH JUDGE NELSON K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketDRIVER LICENSE CHECK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 09/26/2017 AT 9:00 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE NELSON, KATHRYN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/25/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CT001658 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less