This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/26/2021 at 05:44:03 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. PRIANTI, CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PRIANTI, CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********38 B

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PRIANTI, CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN

Defendant Attorney

GROSE, CHARLOTTE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/12/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

3/12/2021: ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

MOTION TO CONTINUE ( V )

3/9/2021: MOTION TO CONTINUE ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

2/8/2021: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V )

2/5/2021: RETURN MAIL ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V )

2/3/2021: RETURN MAIL ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

1/29/2021: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/28/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

1/27/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

1/27/2021: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/25/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/25/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION ( V )

1/22/2021: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

1/11/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V ) ( V )

1/8/2021: ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V ) ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V ) ( V )

1/6/2021: BOND RECEIVED ( V ) ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V ) ( V )

1/6/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V ) ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

1/5/2021: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY DEFENSE MOTION PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: HILBURN, PATRICK - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CF000038 B, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. PRIANTI, CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-3/12/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 05/18/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO CONTINUE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS51368964 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS51368965 POSTED $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/05/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF000039 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN