This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/27/2023 at 05:21:35 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. PLEZIMEAU, JEAN S

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PLEZIMEAU, JEAN S. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, KATHRYN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********56 A

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, KATHRYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PLEZIMEAU, JEAN S

 

Court Documents

BOND RECEIVED

11/28/2022: BOND RECEIVED

NOTICE ON DEMAND

11/28/2022: NOTICE ON DEMAND

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

11/29/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NO INFORMATION

12/9/2022: NO INFORMATION

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

12/9/2022: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT - MISDEMEANOR; Judge: NELSON, KATHRYN; Location: Courtroom 2C - HC; Result: NO INFORMATION OF CASE PRIOR TO COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT JAIL; Judge: NELSON, KATHRYN; Location: Courtroom 2C - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges; Count: 1; Description: BATTERY (784.03.1A1); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MEREUS, WILSON - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022MM002456 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. PLEZIMEAU, JEAN S - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CDB-12/9/2022"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC151919313 (784.03.1A1) RELEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: MADDEN, CONSTANCE DEBORAH ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT - MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 12/15/2022 AT 8:30 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 12/14/2022 AT 9:30 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC151919313 POSTED $15,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE NELSON, KATHRYN: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/28/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022MM002456 A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant