Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/20/2021 at 17:04:38 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. PIERRE-LOUIS, STANLEY

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PIERRE-LOUIS, STANLEY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHWAB, CHARLES A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********36 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PIERRE-LOUIS, STANLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWEET, LAUREN KATHERYN

Defendant Attorneys

LESS, ADAM DAVID

HAUGEN, SHANNON

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4572.2838 / 4832933) ( V )

3/16/2021: ORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4572.2838 / 4832933) ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

3/16/2021: ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

3/1/2021: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

2/25/2021: PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

2/10/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

2/5/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE ( V )

1/19/2021: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

1/19/2021: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

1/5/2021: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

1/4/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/30/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION ( V )

12/30/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

12/14/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

12/14/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

12/14/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

12/14/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

12/14/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

12/11/2020: WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: MM COST; Description: MM Court Cost; Assessment: $223.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $223.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: COP CF; Description: Cost of Prosecution; Assessment: $100.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: COI; Description: Cost of Investigation; Assessment: $25.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4572.2838 / 4832933) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (Other.4563.221 / 4824880) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: LESS, ADAM DAVID - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002236 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. PIERRE-LOUIS, STANLEY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: EFJDGSENT-3/1/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CHANGE OF PLEA ENTERED / SENTENCE IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCASE UNSECURED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $5000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 19056202013967

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002236 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWEET, LAUREN KATHERYN