Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 05/30/2021 at 12:02:30 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. PESTA, SARAHBETH

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PESTA, SARAHBETH. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, KATHRYN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********76 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, KATHRYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PESTA, SARAHBETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

Defendant Attorney

YATES, E CLAYTON

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

4/28/2021: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

NO INFORMATION ( V )

4/28/2021: NO INFORMATION ( V )

TRANSFER CASE LETTER

3/31/2021: TRANSFER CASE LETTER

INFORMATION ( V )

3/30/2021: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/18/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE ( V )

3/18/2021: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

3/18/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY ( V )

3/18/2021: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

3/1/2021: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

3/2/2021: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/2/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE ON DEMAND

3/2/2021: NOTICE ON DEMAND

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT ( V )

3/1/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT ( V )

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: BATTERY (784.03.1A1); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: HILBURN, PATRICK - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021MM000376 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. PESTA, SARAHBETH - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CDB-4/28/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS51374583 (784.03.1A1) RELEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: YATES, E CLAYTON - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021MM000376 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. PESTA, SARAHBETH - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NIF-4/28/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: YATES, E CLAYTON ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: NELSON, KATHRYN; Location: Courtroom 2C - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketTRANSFERRED TO 2021CF000792 A

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 03/25/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS51374583 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 03/10/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE NELSON, KATHRYN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/01/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021MM000376 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE, REBECCA IVY