This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 11/23/2021 at 08:29:05 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. PEREZ, RONY

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PEREZ, RONY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MIRMAN, LAWRENCE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********54 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PEREZ, RONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWEET, LAUREN KATHERYN

Defendant Attorney

DADAN, SASHA GYSEMIA

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION ( V )

10/8/2021: INFORMATION ( V )

COURT MINUTES ( V )

10/4/2021: COURT MINUTES ( V )

ORDER ( V )

10/4/2021: ORDER ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

9/30/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

MOTION TO MODIFY PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) ( V )

9/28/2021: MOTION TO MODIFY PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

9/27/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE ( V )

9/27/2021: NOTICE ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

9/27/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

9/23/2021: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

9/23/2021: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT ( V )

9/20/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT ( V )

WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

9/17/2021: WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: BATTERY BY STRANGULATION ( (784.041.2A); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Transferred

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketTRANSFERRED TO 2021MM002035 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: SWEET, LAUREN KATHERYN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Judge: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CASE HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketMOTION HEARING SET FOR 10/04/2021 AT 10:30 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO MODIFY PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketARREST REPORT - NOT INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $30000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 19056202117987

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MIRMAN, LAWRENCE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/14/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF002254 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWEET, LAUREN KATHERYN