This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/12/2023 at 16:41:37 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. PAGE, RYAN KEITH

Case Summary

On 02/05/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PAGE, RYAN KEITH. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, KATHRYN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********13 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, KATHRYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PAGE, RYAN KEITH

 

Court Documents

WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

2/14/2018: WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT

2/14/2018: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

2/15/2018: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

2/15/2018: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

2/19/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

3/13/2018: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/16/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NO INFORMATION ( V )

3/27/2018: NO INFORMATION ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

3/27/2018: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

4/2/2018: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: NELSON, KATHRYN; Location: Courtroom 2C - HC; Result: NO INFORMATION OF CASE PRIOR TO COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • ChargeCharges; Count: 1; Description: BATTERY (784.03.1); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT, (SELF REPRESENTED). ASA JONATHON R. ALFORD WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. NO PLEA ENTERED TO CT.1 BATTERY (784.03.1-3). **CT.1 DROPPED / ABANDONED, DECISION DATE: 3/27/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5431386 (784.03.1-3) RELEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 03/27/2018 AT 9:30 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $2500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 1905620182804

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE NELSON, KATHRYN: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/05/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018MM000313 A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant