This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/23/2020 at 02:13:42 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. PACE, BOND

Case Summary

On 07/17/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PACE, BOND. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SWEET, GARY L and LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********51 A

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SWEET, GARY L

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PACE, BOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

Defendant Attorney

COUZENS, STEVEN EDWARD

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4157.1601 / 4458586) ( V )

7/17/2018: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4157.1601 / 4458586) ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

7/13/2018: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

7/2/2018: PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

LETTER TO JUDGE ( V )

11/20/2017: LETTER TO JUDGE ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

9/15/2017: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

SEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V )

8/30/2017: SEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V )

7/31/2017: RETURN MAIL ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

7/24/2017: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

7/21/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V ) ( V )

7/21/2017: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V ) ( V )

EXTRADITION COST MEMO ( V )

7/20/2017: EXTRADITION COST MEMO ( V )

EXTRADITION COST MEMO ( V ) ( V )

7/20/2017: EXTRADITION COST MEMO ( V ) ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V ) ( V )

7/20/2017: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V ) ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V ) ( V )

7/20/2017: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V ) ( V )

WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V ) ( V )

7/20/2017: WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V ) ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V ) ( V )

7/20/2017: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V ) ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V ) ( V )

7/20/2017: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V ) ( V )

WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V ) ( V )

7/20/2017: WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V ) ( V )

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4157.1601 / 4458586) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF COMMUNITY CONTROL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4157.556 / 4458277) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM COMMITMENT TO DOC ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF COMMUNITY CONTROL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • HearingEvent: TRIAL DOCKET; Judge: LEVIN, STEVEN J; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CHANGE OF PLEA ENTERED / SENTENCE IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 3; Description: FAILURE OF SEX OFFENDER TO REPORT CHANGE IN TELEPHONE NUMBER, EMPLOYMENT INFORMAITON AND HIGHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION STATUS (943.0435.9A); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: ADJUDICATED GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 2; Description: FAILURE OF SEX OFFENDER TO REPORT E-MAIL ADDRESS OR INTERNET IDENTIFIERS TO FDLE (943.0435.14C4); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Nolle Prosequi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: FAILURE OF SEX OFFENDER TO REPORT E-MAIL ADDRESS OR INTERNET IDENTIFIERS TO FDLE (943.0435.14A4); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Nolle Prosequi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIN-COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE LEVIN, STEVEN J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/17/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF001953 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/17/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF001951 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less