This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/11/2023 at 08:40:13 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. OBERRY, ALEX

Case Summary

On 09/28/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against OBERRY, ALEX. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, KATHRYN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********43 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, KATHRYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

OBERRY, ALEX

 

Court Documents

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT

9/28/2017: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT

NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION

9/28/2017: NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

9/28/2017: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED

9/28/2017: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

9/29/2017: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

10/4/2017: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

10/4/2017: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/6/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

10/6/2017: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/6/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NO INFORMATION ( V )

10/10/2017: NO INFORMATION ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

10/16/2017: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney HAROLD CHRISTOPHER WALSH III - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: NELSON, KATHRYN; Location: Courtroom 2C - HC; Result: NOLLE PROSEQUI OF CASE PRIOR TO COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT JAIL; Judge: NELSON, KATHRYN; Location: Courtroom 2C - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • ChargeCharges; Count: 1; Description: BATTERY (784.03.1A1); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSURETY BOND IS3K310965 (784.03.1A1) RELEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketREMOVED PUBLIC DEFENDER FEE PER F.S. 939.06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: WALSH, HAROLD CHRISTOPHER III ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE NELSON, KATHRYN: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/28/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017MM002443 A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant