This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/20/2021 at 12:40:53 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. NAPOLEON, RUDICK

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against NAPOLEON, RUDICK. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********50 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

NAPOLEON, RUDICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STROKE, LINDSAY CHRISTINA

Defendant Attorneys

COUZENS, STEVEN EDWARD

NASH, AISHA A

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

2/1/2021: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ( V )

1/25/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

1/22/2021: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

ORDER REVOKING PRETRIAL RELEASE 1CC SLCSO ( V )

1/14/2021: ORDER REVOKING PRETRIAL RELEASE 1CC SLCSO ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/6/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

1/4/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

12/4/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/16/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

11/10/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

11/10/2020: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

11/9/2020: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

11/6/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/6/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/6/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

9/21/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

9/21/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

9/29/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketARREST REPORT - NOT INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketARREST REPORT - NOT INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCASE UNSECURED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketREARRESTED ON 01/22/2021: OBTS # Q560163255

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketPRETRIAL RELEASE WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCLERK NOTE: DEFENDANT ARRESTED IN INDIAN RIVER COUNTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 11/06/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STROKE, LINDSAY CHRISTINA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5896944 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5896945 POSTED $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002250 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NASH, AISHA A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COUZENS, STEVEN EDWARD