This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/23/2020 at 04:06:18 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MUNIZ, JOCELYN MARIA

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MUNIZ, JOCELYN MARIA. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********99 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MUNIZ, JOCELYN MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STROKE, LINDSAY CHRISTINA

Defendant Attorney

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION ( V )

10/9/2020: NO INFORMATION ( V )

SEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V )

9/30/2020: SEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/30/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

9/25/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

9/25/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: SALE, MANUFACTURE,DELIVERY, OR POSSESSION WITH INTENT TO SELL, MANUFACTURE OR DELIVER AMPHETAMINE (893.13.1A2); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STROKE, LINDSAY CHRISTINA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002299 A

    Read MoreRead Less