This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/23/2020 at 04:01:16 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MORRIS, ANGELA MARIE

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MORRIS, ANGELA MARIE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHWAB, CHARLES A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********26 B

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MORRIS, ANGELA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORMIER, JUSTIN

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION ( V )

9/25/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V ) ( V )

9/8/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V ) ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V ) ( V )

9/8/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V ) ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 11/09/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: CORMIER, JUSTIN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED FROM 2020CF002129 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002126 B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND U3120801029 POSTED $15,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/08/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002129 A

    Read MoreRead Less