This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 11/07/2021 at 12:12:08 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MONTESANO, STEPHEN JEFFREY JR

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MONTESANO, STEPHEN JEFFREY JR. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HENDRIKS, JEFFREY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********81 A

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

MONTESANO, STEPHEN JEFFREY

MONTESANO, STEPHEN JEFFREY JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FARACH, PAIGE MEREDITH

MITTLEMAN, DANIEL MARC

Defendant Attorneys

ARRIETA, MANUEL EDUARDO

OFFICE OF CRIMINAL CONFLICT AND CIVIL REGIONAL COUNSEL

DADAN, SASHA GYSEMIA

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

10/27/2021: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

10/14/2021: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

10/13/2021: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

RETURN MAIL ( V )

10/12/2021: RETURN MAIL ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

9/30/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ORDER DISMISSING WARRANT ( V )

9/29/2021: ORDER DISMISSING WARRANT ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

9/27/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

UNSIGNED BENCH WARRANT

9/24/2021: UNSIGNED BENCH WARRANT

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

9/23/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

9/23/2021: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

SUMMONS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

9/3/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

8/24/2021: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

ORDER APPT COUNSEL/CONFLICT COUNSEL/REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V )

8/13/2021: ORDER APPT COUNSEL/CONFLICT COUNSEL/REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

8/12/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

8/11/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

8/9/2021: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

8/9/2021: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

8/9/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: COP MM; Description: Cost of Prosecution; Assessment: $100.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: COI; Description: Cost of Investigation; Assessment: $25.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: MM COST; Description: MM Court Cost; Assessment: $223.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $223.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4711.1927 / 4944796) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: ARRIETA, MANUEL EDUARDO ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DADAN, SASHA GYSEMIA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021MM001581 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. MONTESANO, STEPHEN JEFFREY JR - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: EFJDGSENT-10/27/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - A; Judge: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY; Location: Courtroom 1D - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - ADI0C4E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ADI0C4E

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT - MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 09/22/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN 1D/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC51641560 POSTED $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC51641559 POSTED $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 08/19/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN 1D/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE HENDRIKS, JEFFREY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/09/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021MM001581 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITTLEMAN, DANIEL MARC

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARACH, PAIGE MEREDITH