This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/23/2020 at 04:04:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MOHAMED, JENNIFER MARIE

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MOHAMED, JENNIFER MARIE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********88 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MOHAMED, JENNIFER MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

10/5/2020: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

10/5/2020: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/25/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

9/23/2020: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

9/23/2020: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

8/18/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

BOND RECEIVED

8/17/2020: BOND RECEIVED

NOTICE ON DEMAND

8/17/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT

8/12/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount; Code: PDAPP; Description: Public Defender Application; Assessment: $50.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: WHITE, REBECCA IVY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketTRANSFERRED FROM 2020MM001283 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE HENDRIKS, JEFFREY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCASE UNSECURED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $1500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 19056202013058

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE HENDRIKS, JEFFREY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/07/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020MM001283 A

    Read MoreRead Less