Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 06/19/2021 at 12:22:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MILLS, MATTHEW ROBERT

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MILLS, MATTHEW ROBERT. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********22 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MILLS, MATTHEW ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORTEZ, KIMBERLY KATHLEEN

Defendant Attorneys

ELLIOTT, ALEXANDER C

NELSON, JENNIFER A

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

6/8/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

6/1/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

4/21/2021: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NO INFORMATION ( V )

3/31/2021: NO INFORMATION ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

3/31/2021: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

3/31/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

3/29/2021: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

3/16/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

3/12/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

3/9/2021: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • HearingEvent: CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCHANGE OF PLEA HEARING SET FOR 06/22/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN 3B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: NELSON, JENNIFER A ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY DEFENSE MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DOCKET CALL: DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT IN OPEN COURT, IN JAIL. APD A. ELLIOTT WAS PRESENT. ASA L. STROKE WAS PRESENT FOR ASA K. CORTEZ VIA ZOOM. DEFENSE MADE A MOTION TO CONTINUE. MOTION GRANTED. CASE SET FOR DOCKET CALL ON 07/13/2021 AT 9:00 AM. DB/LN/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 07/13/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 05/14/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: CORTEZ, KIMBERLY KATHLEEN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: ELLIOTT, ALEXANDER C ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/09/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF000622 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIOTT, ALEXANDER C

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NELSON, JENNIFER A