Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 06/11/2020 at 04:22:04 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MILLER, JAYSON

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MILLER, JAYSON. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HENDRIKS, JEFFREY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********33 A

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

MILLER, JAYSON JOSHUA

MILLER, JAYSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STONE, ROBERT E JR

Defendant Attorneys

GROSE, CHARLOTTE

DUTEAU, WHITNEY LYNN

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS

4/30/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

4/23/2020: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

VIOL OF PROBATION WARRANT RETURNED SERVED

3/19/2020: VIOL OF PROBATION WARRANT RETURNED SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION

3/17/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION

VIOLATION OF PROBATION WARRANT

3/17/2020: VIOLATION OF PROBATION WARRANT

ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

3/5/2020: ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

2/5/2020: PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

COMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL ( V )

2/4/2020: COMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

1/30/2020: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

1/30/2020: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

1/29/2020: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

1/21/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

1/16/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

1/14/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

1/9/2020: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

NOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT ( V )

12/5/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/9/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

VICTIM-WITNESS STATEMENT ( V )

12/5/2019: VICTIM-WITNESS STATEMENT ( V )

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (Other.4417.1267 / 4705773)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT JAIL; Judge: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY; Location: Courtroom 2E - HC; Result: SENTENCE IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT JAIL; Judge: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY; Location: Courtroom 2E - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINES AND COST DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketPROBATION TERMINATED 04/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketREOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: ARRAIGNMENT JAIL: (IN JAIL). APPEARED VIA JAIL VIDEO. WITH APD WHITNEY L. DUTEAU. ASA ROBERT E. STONE JR WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. APD AND ASA PRESENT VIA ZOOM. DEFT WAS FOUND INCOMPETENT. DEFENSE MOTION TO DISMISS VOP- GRANTED BY JUDGE. UNPAID FEES REDUCED TO A CIVIL LIEN. , DISPOSITION: CT.1 ADJUDICATED GUILTY : REVOKE AND TERMINATE PROBATION. PAY: PDAPP $50.00; ($50.00 CONVERTED TO LIEN); MM COST $223.00; ($223.00 CONVERTED TO LIEN); RAPE CRISIS $151.00; ($151.00 CONVERTED TO LIEN); DOMVIO CHARGE $201.00; ($201.00 CONVERTED TO LIEN); COP MM $100.00; ($100.00 CONVERTED TO LIEN); COI $25.00; ($25.00 CONVERTED TO LIEN); PDFEES MM $50.00; ($50.00 CONVERTED TO LIEN); BALANCE DUE = $800.00 ($800.00 CONVERTED TO LIEN); .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 04/23/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 2E/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT - MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 01/29/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 2E/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVICTIM-WITNESS STATEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE HENDRIKS, JEFFREY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/05/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019MM002833 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUTEAU, WHITNEY LYNN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROSE, CHARLOTTE