This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/24/2020 at 04:06:17 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MILLER, JASON S

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MILLER, JASON S. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHWAB, CHARLES A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********57 B

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MILLER, JASON S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWEET, LAUREN KATHERYN

Defendant Attorney

SALE, SCOTT JORDAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/22/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

10/22/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

10/21/2020: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

AFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF SUPERVISION ( V )

9/22/2020: AFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF SUPERVISION ( V )

ORDER REVOKING PRETRIAL RELEASE

9/22/2020: ORDER REVOKING PRETRIAL RELEASE

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

10/13/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

9/18/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

9/18/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

MOTION ( V )

9/17/2020: MOTION ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V ) ( V )

9/17/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V ) ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

9/17/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

9/16/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V ) ( V )

9/15/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V ) ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V ) ( V )

9/15/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V ) ( V )

ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V ) ( V )

9/11/2020: ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V ) ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT ( V ) ( V )

9/11/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT ( V ) ( V )

ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V ) ( V )

9/11/2020: ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V ) ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

9/11/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • HearingEvent: CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SALE, SCOTT JORDAN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002157 B, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. MILLER, JASON S - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-10/22/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCHANGE OF PLEA HEARING SET FOR 10/23/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - NOT INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCASE UNSECURED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketREARRESTED ON 10/20/2020: OBTS # Q560161160

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5877428 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/11/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002159 A

    Read MoreRead Less