This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/16/2020 at 01:56:38 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MILLER, FRANKLIN TOBIAS

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MILLER, FRANKLIN TOBIAS. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********39 A

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MILLER, FRANKLIN TOBIAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIBBY, JONATHON

Defendant Attorney

WALSH, HAROLD CHRISTOPHER III

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION ( V )

2/12/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

2/11/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

1/17/2020: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

1/16/2020: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

12/23/2019: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

11/26/2019: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

11/26/2019: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

11/19/2019: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE ( V )

11/12/2019: NOTICE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/23/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

10/22/2019: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

10/22/2019: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

10/22/2019: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

10/22/2019: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

10/22/2019: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED

10/21/2019: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

10/19/2019: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • HearingEvent: TRIAL DOCKET; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 06/09/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketTRIAL DOCKET SET FOR 05/18/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC; Result: CASE HEARD / NEW COURT DATE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DOCKET CALL: DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT IN OPEN COURT, IN JAIL. APD H. WALSH AND ASA J. LIBBY WAS PRESENT. READY FOR TRIAL ANNOUNCED. CASE SET FOR TRIAL DOCKET ON 05/18/2020 AT 9:200 AM. DB/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY DEFENSE MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DOCKET CALL- DEFENDANT DID NOT APPEAR IN OPEN COURT (IN CUSTODY). APD S COUZENS FOR APD C WALSH AND ASA J LIBBY WERE PRESENT. DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE WAS GRANTED. CASE SET FOR DOCKET CALL ON 03/10/2020 AT 9:00 AM. KB/LN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/18/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CF002839 A

    Read MoreRead Less