This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/23/2020 at 04:05:17 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MEEKS, DAVID CHARLES

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MEEKS, DAVID CHARLES. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********92 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MEEKS, DAVID CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

9/15/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

9/15/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

9/15/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

9/14/2020: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: WHITE, REBECCA IVY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketTRANSFERRED FROM 2020CT001634 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002292 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DEPALMA, JOSEPH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CT001634 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. MEEKS, DAVID CHARLES - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-9/15/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT - CRIMINAL TRAFFIC SET FOR 10/20/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 2E/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - ADC2L5E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS6K721626 POSTED $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDRIVER LICENSE CHECK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 09/24/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 2E/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE HENDRIKS, JEFFREY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/14/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CT001634 A

    Read MoreRead Less