Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 06/06/2021 at 12:22:27 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MCLOUGHLIN, KEVIN JAMES

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MCLOUGHLIN, KEVIN JAMES. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********09 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MCLOUGHLIN, KEVIN JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORTEZ, KIMBERLY KATHLEEN

Defendant Attorneys

ELLIOTT, ALEXANDER C

OFFICE OF CRIMINAL CONFLICT AND CIVIL REGIONAL COUNSEL

VAN VONNO, ERIC NICOLAAS

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

5/4/2021: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

4/23/2021: IN-COURT NOTES

DIVERSION AGREEMENT ( V )

4/23/2021: DIVERSION AGREEMENT ( V )

ORDER FOR RELEASE ( V )

4/23/2021: ORDER FOR RELEASE ( V )

DIVERSION AGREEMENT ( V )

4/23/2021: DIVERSION AGREEMENT ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

4/9/2021: IN-COURT NOTES

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

4/7/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

4/4/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY ( V )

4/4/2021: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

3/30/2021: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

ORDER APPT COUNSEL/CONFLICT COUNSEL/REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V )

4/1/2021: ORDER APPT COUNSEL/CONFLICT COUNSEL/REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

3/31/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

3/29/2021: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

3/26/2021: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

3/26/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

3/24/2021: INFORMATION ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

3/8/2021: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

3/10/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • HearingEvent: VETERANS COURT; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: VETERANS COURT; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC; Result: CASE HEARD / NEW COURT DATE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: VETERANS COURT- DEFENDANT APPEARED IN COURT THRU ZOOM. DOING WELL. CASE SET FOR REVIEW ON 06/11/2021 AT 1:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketVETERANS COURT SET FOR 06/11/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN 3B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketVETERANS COURT SET FOR 05/28/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN 3B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • HearingEvent: VETERANS COURT; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC; Result: CASE HEARD / NEW COURT DATE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: VETERANS COURT: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT VIA ZOOM VIDEO. CASE SET FOR ADDITIONAL REVIEW ON 05/28/2021 AT 1:30 PM. AP/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 05/14/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: CORTEZ, KIMBERLY KATHLEEN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: ELLIOTT, ALEXANDER C ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/08/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF000609 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAN VONNO, ERIC NICOLAAS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIOTT, ALEXANDER C