This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/22/2020 at 04:02:53 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MALTAIS, ALEXANDRA LEIGH

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MALTAIS, ALEXANDRA LEIGH. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********93 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MALTAIS, ALEXANDRA LEIGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STROKE, LINDSAY CHRISTINA

 

Court Documents

SEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V )

9/30/2020: SEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

9/30/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

9/30/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS51363356 POSTED $3,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002293 A

    Read MoreRead Less