Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 04/15/2021 at 02:25:19 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MALONEY, ROBERT A

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MALONEY, ROBERT A. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HENDRIKS, JEFFREY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********91 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MALONEY, ROBERT A

 

Court Documents

SUBPOENA ISSUED

4/9/2021: SUBPOENA ISSUED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

4/9/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • HearingEvent: ORDINANCE NON-JURY; Judge: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY; Location: Courtroom 1D - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount; Code: WIT SUBPOENA TR CASES; Description: Issuing Witness Subpoena; Assessment: $7.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: ANIMAL; Description: Animal Control; Assessment: $323.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $323.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketORDINANCE NON-JURY SET FOR 05/21/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN 1D/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED : PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 04/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCITATION 2354AC FILED, OFFENSE DATE 03/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE HENDRIKS, JEFFREY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/09/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CO000291 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCITATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant