This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 12/30/2022 at 16:27:29 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MAHMOUD, YASER RASHID

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MAHMOUD, YASER RASHID. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HENDRIKS, JEFFREY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********38 A

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MAHMOUD, YASER RASHID

 

Court Documents

NOTICE ON DEMAND

6/1/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND

BOND RECEIVED

6/1/2020: BOND RECEIVED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

6/1/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT

6/1/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

6/24/2020: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

WARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT

5/18/2020: WARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

7/20/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

7/20/2020: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

7/20/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NO INFORMATION

7/20/2020: NO INFORMATION

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

7/20/2020: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - A; Judge: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY; Location: Courtroom 2E - HC; Result: NO INFORMATION OF CASE PRIOR TO COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT - MISDEMEANOR; Judge: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY; Location: Courtroom 2E - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: BATTERY (784.03.1A1); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: GASKIN, VINCENT - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020MM000938 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. MAHMOUD, YASER RASHID - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CDB-7/20/2020"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC15862256 (784.03.1A1) RELEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: STONE, ROBERT EUGENE - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020MM000938 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. MAHMOUD, YASER RASHID - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NIF-7/20/2020"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: REID, KATY ELIZABETH ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCASE UNSECURED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $10000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 19056202012439

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE HENDRIKS, JEFFREY: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020MM000938 A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less