This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/25/2020 at 05:46:00 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. LUNA VAZQUEZ, DANIEL

Case Summary

On 02/19/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LUNA VAZQUEZ, DANIEL. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VAUGHN, DAN L and BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********59 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VAUGHN, DAN L

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

LUNA VAZQUEZ, DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LIBBY, JONATHON

MOSELEY, AMBER

Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS, DAVID ALEXANDER

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

8/28/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

8/28/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

8/26/2019: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

IN-COURT NOTES

8/22/2019: IN-COURT NOTES

RETURN MAIL ( V )

7/25/2019: RETURN MAIL ( V )

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ( V )

9/25/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ( V )

MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

5/23/2018: MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

5/11/2018: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

4/17/2018: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

4/17/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

4/16/2018: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

4/14/2018: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/9/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

3/8/2018: CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

2/22/2018: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

2/21/2018: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

2/21/2018: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

2/21/2018: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2019
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: RAPE CRISIS; Description: Rape Crisis Trust Fund; Assessment: $151.06; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $151.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: PDFEES CF; Description: Public Defender Fees; Assessment: $100.04; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $100.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: CRIME VS MINOR; Description: Crimes Against Minor; Assessment: $151.06; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $151.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: COP CF; Description: Cost of Prosecution; Assessment: $200.07; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $200.07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: COI; Description: Cost of Investigation; Assessment: $50.02; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: CF COST; Description: CF Court Cost; Assessment: $418.16; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $418.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4317.609 / 4613609) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM COMMITMENT TO DOC ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (Other.4314.2174 / 4611513) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $25000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 1905620182875

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE VAUGHN, DAN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/19/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018CF000459 A

    Read MoreRead Less