This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/02/2023 at 07:05:25 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. LACAYO, MELBA MARIA ROJAS

Case Summary

On 09/12/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LACAYO, MELBA MARIA ROJAS. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is YACUCCI, PHILIP J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********60 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

YACUCCI, PHILIP J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

LACAYO, MELBA MARIA ROJAS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT ( V )

9/12/2018: NOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT ( V )

VICTIM-WITNESS STATEMENT ( V )

9/12/2018: VICTIM-WITNESS STATEMENT ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

10/10/2018: INFORMATION ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

10/17/2018: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

11/5/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

12/10/2018: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

ORDER OF MODIFICATION OF PROBATION ( V )

1/4/2019: ORDER OF MODIFICATION OF PROBATION ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

1/4/2019: ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4220.2043 / 4517915) ( V )

1/8/2019: ORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4220.2043 / 4517915) ( V )

COMMUNITY SERVICE COMPLETION ( V )

5/31/2019: COMMUNITY SERVICE COMPLETION ( V )

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TERMINATE PROBATION ( V )

6/3/2019: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TERMINATE PROBATION ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $125.00 RECEIPT #2019000046796

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketMM COST CONVERTED TO COMMUNITY SERVICE $223.0000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT # 2019000039812 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TERMINATE PROBATION ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketPROBATION TERMINATED 06/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMMUNITY SERVICE COMPLETION ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $125.00 RECEIPT #2019000039812 RECEIVED FOR ACCOUNT NUMBER 2018MM002260 A VIA CORE051019.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4220.2043 / 4517915) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF MODIFICATION OF PROBATION ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2018
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT - CRIMINAL TRAFFIC; Judge: YACUCCI, PHILIP J; Location: Courtroom 1D - HC; Result: CASE HEARD / NEW COURT DATE SET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: ARRAIGNMENT - CRIMINAL TRAFFIC: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT, (SELF REPRESENTED). ASA KIMBERLY K. CORTEZ WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. DEFT ENTERED THE DPP PROGRAM PAPERWORK COMPLETED IN OPEN COURT. CASE CONTINUED TO 5/9/2019 @ 2:00. DEFENDANT RECEIVED RETURN CARD. , DISPOSITION: CT.1 NO VERDICT RENDERED : .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: CORTEZ, KIMBERLY KATHLEEN ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT - CRIMINAL TRAFFIC SET FOR 10/17/2018 AT 9:00 AM IN 1D/ , COUNTY JUDGE: YACUCCI, PHILIP J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketVICTIM-WITNESS STATEMENT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE YACUCCI, PHILIP J: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/12/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018MM002260 A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant