This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/14/2023 at 13:27:50 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. KERR, DAVID J

Case Summary

On 01/30/2007 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KERR, DAVID J. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is YACUCCI, PHILIP J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********74 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

YACUCCI, PHILIP J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

KERR, DAVID J

 

Court Documents

Information Filed INFORMATION FILED

1/30/2007: Information Filed INFORMATION FILED

Capias Issued CAPIAS ISSUED - DIRECT FILE

1/30/2007: Capias Issued CAPIAS ISSUED - DIRECT FILE

1ST APPEARANCE ARREST AND CONFINEMENT FILED 1ST APPEARANCE ARREST AND CONF

1/30/2007: 1ST APPEARANCE ARREST AND CONFINEMENT FILED 1ST APPEARANCE ARREST AND CONF

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING P

2/5/2007: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING P

1ST APPEARANCE ARREST AND CONFINEMENT FILED 1ST APPEARANCE ARREST AND CONF

2/5/2007: 1ST APPEARANCE ARREST AND CONFINEMENT FILED 1ST APPEARANCE ARREST AND CONF

CAPIAS RETURNED SERVED ARREST AFFIDAVIT FILED 3/8 10:00 AM JAIL 1ST APPEARANCE ARREST AND CONFINEMENT FILED PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

2/5/2007: CAPIAS RETURNED SERVED ARREST AFFIDAVIT FILED 3/8 10:00 AM JAIL 1ST APPEARANCE ARREST AND CONFINEMENT FILED PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

COMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL FILED.

2/19/2007: COMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL FILED.

JUDGMENT OF GUILT & PROBATION TO CORE FILED

3/7/2007: JUDGMENT OF GUILT & PROBATION TO CORE FILED

ORDER OF MODIFICATION OF PROBATION FILED CCMB 429 PG 200 AMEND TO PERFORM 29 HRS C.S. IN LIEU OF $193

7/6/2007: ORDER OF MODIFICATION OF PROBATION FILED CCMB 429 PG 200 AMEND TO PERFORM 29 HRS C.S. IN LIEU OF $193

PETITION FOR AND TERMINATION OF PROBATION FILED CCMB 440 PG 259

10/18/2007: PETITION FOR AND TERMINATION OF PROBATION FILED CCMB 440 PG 259

 

Docket Entries

12/10/2007

DocketCORE CK # 14553, COI-$25, ASA-$24-NOTES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2007
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION FOR AND TERMINATION OF PROBATION FILED CCMB 440 PG 259

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2007
View Court Documents

DocketORDER OF MODIFICATION OF PROBATION FILED CCMB 429 PG 200 AMEND TO PERFORM 29 HRS C.S. IN LIEU OF $193

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2007
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT OF GUILT & PROBATION TO CORE FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2007
View Court Documents

DocketCOMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2007

HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: YACUCCI, PHILIP J; Location: Courtroom A - HC; Result: DISPOSED BY JUDGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2007

HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: YACUCCI, PHILIP J; Location: Courtroom A - HC; Result: DISPOSED BY JUDGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2007

ChargeCharges; Count: 2; Description: DISORDERLY CONDUCT (877.03); Level: M; Degree: S; Plea: NOLO-CONTENDERE; Disposition: ADJUDICATED GUILTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2007

ChargeCharges; Count: 1; Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF 200 TO 1000 (806.13.1B2); Level: M; Degree: F; Plea: NOLO-CONTENDERE; Disposition: ADJUDICATED GUILTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2007

DocketADJ GUILTY; TIME SERVED ONLY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
02/05/2007
View Court Documents

DocketCAPIAS RETURNED SERVED ARREST AFFIDAVIT FILED 3/8 10:00 AM JAIL 1ST APPEARANCE ARREST AND CONFINEMENT FILED PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2007
View Court Documents

Docket1ST APPEARANCE ARREST AND CONFINEMENT FILED 1ST APPEARANCE ARREST AND CONF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2007

DocketArrest Affidavit Filed ARREST AFFIDAVIT FILED 3/8 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2007
View Court Documents

DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING P

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2007

DocketTRANSFERRED FROM FELONY FELONY CASE # 562006CF006138A INFORMATION FILED CAPIAS ISSUED - DIRECT FILE ARREST AFFIDAVIT FILED - COPY OF FELONY ARREST 1ST APPEARANCE ARREST AND CONFINEMENT FILED - COPY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2007

DocketTRANSFERRED FROM FELONY FELONY CASE # 562006CF006138A INFORMATION FILED CAPIAS ISSUED - DIRECT FILE ARREST AFFIDAVIT FILED - COPY OF FELONY ARREST 1ST APPEARANCE ARREST AND CONFINEMENT FILED -COPY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2007
View Court Documents

Docket1ST APPEARANCE ARREST AND CONFINEMENT FILED 1ST APPEARANCE ARREST AND CONF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2007

DocketArrest Affidavit Filed ARREST AFFIDAVIT FILED - COPY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2007
View Court Documents

DocketCapias Issued CAPIAS ISSUED - DIRECT FILE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2007
View Court Documents

DocketInformation Filed INFORMATION FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less