This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/23/2020 at 12:31:05 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. KENNEDY, LYNDSEY JANE

Case Summary

On 08/30/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KENNEDY, LYNDSEY JANE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCCANN, JAMES W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********90 A

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCCANN, JAMES W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

KENNEDY, LYNDSEY JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMARTT, NIRLAINE TALLANDIER

Defendant Attorney

DOMINGUEZ, LIZET

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION

10/4/2017: NO INFORMATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

9/27/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

9/25/2017: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

9/22/2017: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT

9/22/2017: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT

EXTRADITION COST MEMO- PALM BEACH CO- $75.00

9/22/2017: EXTRADITION COST MEMO- PALM BEACH CO- $75.00

WARRANT RETURNED SERVED

9/22/2017: WARRANT RETURNED SERVED

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED

9/22/2017: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 2; Description: RESISTING MERCHANT (812.015.6); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: GRAND THEFT $300 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $5,000 (812.014.2C1); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketREMOVED PUBLIC DEFENDER FEE PER F.S. 939.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: SMARTT, NIRLAINE TALLANDIER ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: DOMINGUEZ, LIZET ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketCASE UNSECURED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $15500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 1905620171673

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MCCANN, JAMES W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/30/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF002390 A

    Read MoreRead Less