Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 18:29:28 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. KARANJA, KWAME ALLEN

Case Summary

On 09/22/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KARANJA, KWAME ALLEN. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is YACUCCI, PHILIP J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********93 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

YACUCCI, PHILIP J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

KARANJA, KWAME ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORTEZ, KIMBERLY KATHLEEN

Defendant Attorneys

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

PETERS, BRETT

HAUGEN, SHANNON

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

9/27/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

NOTICE OF FINES AND COST DUE ( V )

9/17/2018: NOTICE OF FINES AND COST DUE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

8/14/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

8/10/2018: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

8/7/2018: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

8/7/2018: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

VIOL OF PROBATION WARRANT RETURNED UNSERVED ( V )

7/30/2018: VIOL OF PROBATION WARRANT RETURNED UNSERVED ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

3/20/2018: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

2/22/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

2/19/2018: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

12/21/2017: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

12/12/2017: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

12/12/2017: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

VIOL OF PROBATION WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

12/5/2017: VIOL OF PROBATION WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

VIOLATION OF PROBATION WARRANT ( V )

11/29/2017: VIOLATION OF PROBATION WARRANT ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

10/19/2017: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

INFORMATION ( V )

10/4/2017: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT

9/22/2017: NOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney SHANNON HAUGEN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000009714; Applied Amount; $203.07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketPDFEES MM WAIVED BY CLERK $0.5300

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCOP MM WAIVED BY CLERK $1.0700

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $203.07 RECEIPT #2019000009714

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: PDFEES MM; Description: Public Defender Fees; Assessment: $50.53; Paid: $50.00; Waived: $0.53; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: COP MM; Description: Cost of Prosecution; Assessment: $101.07; Paid: $100.00; Waived: $1.07; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4187.839 / 4486653) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL; Judge: YACUCCI, PHILIP J; Location: Courtroom 1D - HC; Result: SENTENCE IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: ARRAIGNMENT - MISDEMEANOR: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT, (SELF REPRESENTED). ASA KIMBERLY K. CORTEZ WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. DEFT ADVISED OF I.N.S. RIGHTS, THE DEFENDANT WAS SWORN, AND DEFENSE ENTERED A PLEA OF NOLO-CONTENDERE TO CT.1 POSSESSION OF 20 GRAMS OR LESS OF CANNABIS (893.13.6B) AND NOLO-CONTENDERE TO CT.2 USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA (893.147.1-3) THE COURT FOUND FACTUAL BASIS AND ACCEPTED PLEA, NO ALCOHOL/NO DRUGS WITHOUT A SCRIPT. PAY IN EQUAL MONTHLY INSTALLMENTS WHILE ON PROBATION, DISPOSITION: CT.1 ADJUDICATION WITHHELD : 1 YEAR PROBATION, EARLY TERMINATION AFTER 6 MONTHS IF ALL CONDS ARE MET., COMPLETE SUBSTANCE ABUSE EVAL/TREAT, RANDOM URINALYSISCT.2 ADJUDICATION WITHHELD : 1 YEAR PROBATION, CONCURRENT TO CT,1.. . PAY: MM COST $223.00; COI $25.00; COP MM $50.00; BALANCE DUE = $298.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: CORTEZ, KIMBERLY KATHLEEN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT - MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 10/19/2017 AT 9:00 AM IN 1D/ , COUNTY JUDGE: YACUCCI, PHILIP J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE YACUCCI, PHILIP J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/22/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017MM002393 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CORTEZ, KIMBERLY KATHLEEN