This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/22/2020 at 04:12:09 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. JOSEPH, MOISE

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JOSEPH, MOISE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********97 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JOSEPH, MOISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ZISKINDER, STEVEN

 

Court Documents

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

9/25/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: ZISKINDER, STEVEN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - INSUFFICIENT INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS1K525933 POSTED $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS15K315154 POSTED $7,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS15K315153 POSTED $7,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS15K315626 POSTED $7,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS15K315625 POSTED $7,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002297 A

    Read MoreRead Less