This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/22/2020 at 04:11:51 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. JONES, NORMAN ROBERT

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JONES, NORMAN ROBERT. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********94 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JONES, NORMAN ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STROKE, LINDSAY CHRISTINA

Defendant Attorney

ELLIOTT, ALEXANDER C

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/9/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

RETURN MAIL ( V )

10/8/2020: RETURN MAIL ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/5/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

10/5/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

10/5/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

10/5/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

10/5/2020: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

9/30/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/29/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

9/25/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: ALVAREZ, DIANA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002294 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. JONES, NORMAN ROBERT - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-10/5/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND 2020AA058594 POSTED $3,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 11/06/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STROKE, LINDSAY CHRISTINA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: ELLIOTT, ALEXANDER C ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002294 A

    Read MoreRead Less