This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/17/2021 at 12:02:57 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. JONES, LAVARIOUS LEON

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JONES, LAVARIOUS LEON. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********40 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JONES, LAVARIOUS LEON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIBBY, JONATHON

Defendant Attorney

COUZENS, STEVEN EDWARD

 

Court Documents

RETURN MAIL ( V )

10/16/2020: RETURN MAIL ( V )

NO INFORMATION ( V )

10/6/2020: NO INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/29/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

9/21/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketAttorney JONATHON LIBBY - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketAttorney STEVEN EDWARD COUZENS - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 2; Description: RESISTING OFFICER WITH VIOLENCE (843.01); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: RESISTING OFFICER WITH VIOLENCE (843.01); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: LIBBY, JONATHON ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: COUZENS, STEVEN EDWARD ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002240 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIBBY, JONATHON