This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 01/19/2021 at 05:36:57 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. JOHNSON, MONTI JAY

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JOHNSON, MONTI JAY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********54 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JOHNSON, MONTI JAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIBBY, JONATHON

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

10/6/2020: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

INFORMATION ( V )

10/6/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

NO INFORMATION ( V )

10/6/2020: NO INFORMATION ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

9/21/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

9/21/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 2; Description: CARRYING CONCEALED FIREARM (790.01.2); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketTRANSFERRED TO 2020MM001933 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: GARCIA, RICARDO - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002254 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. JOHNSON, MONTI JAY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CDB-10/6/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: LIBBY, JONATHON ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: CARRYING CONCEALED FIREARM (790.01.2); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Transferred

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5896950 (790.01.2) RELEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5896950 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002254 A

    Read MoreRead Less