This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/23/2020 at 18:55:10 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. JOHNSON, CALVIN JEROME

Case Summary

On 09/28/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JOHNSON, CALVIN JEROME. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VAUGHN, DAN L and MCCANN, JAMES W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********29 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VAUGHN, DAN L

MCCANN, JAMES W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JOHNSON, CALVIN JEROME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMARTT, NIRLAINE TALLANDIER

Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS, DAVID ALEXANDER

KELLY, REBECCA

 

Court Documents

UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO DOC ( V )

7/3/2018: UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO DOC ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4151.185 / 4452569) ( V )

6/28/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4151.185 / 4452569) ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4150.144 / 4451708) ( V )

6/27/2018: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4150.144 / 4451708) ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

6/22/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

6/18/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET ( V )

6/18/2018: SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET ( V )

PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

6/18/2018: PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

4/19/2018: MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

4/18/2018: ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

3/15/2018: MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

2/12/2018: ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

2/9/2018: MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

REPORT ( V )

2/2/2018: REPORT ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

1/16/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

10/30/2017: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

10/19/2017: INFORMATION ( V )

ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE

9/28/2017: ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

9/28/2017: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney NIRLAINE TALLANDIER SMARTT - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4240.1010 / 4538693) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: RAPE CRISIS; Description: Rape Crisis Trust Fund; Assessment: $162.99; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $162.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: PDFEES CF; Description: Public Defender Fees; Assessment: $107.94; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $107.94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: PDAPP; Description: Public Defender Application; Assessment: $50.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: DOMVIO CHARGE; Description: Domestic Violence Surcharge; Assessment: $216.96; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $216.96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: COP CF; Description: Cost of Prosecution; Assessment: $215.88; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $215.88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: COI; Description: Cost of Investigation; Assessment: $53.96; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $53.96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: CF COST; Description: CF Court Cost; Assessment: $451.19; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $451.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM COMMITMENT TO DOC ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: KELLY, REBECCA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MCCANN, JAMES W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/28/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF002629 A

    Read MoreRead Less