Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 12:54:14 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. JIMENEZ, VINCENTE

Case Summary

On 06/25/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JIMENEZ, VINCENTE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are YACUCCI, PHILIP J and ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********27 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

YACUCCI, PHILIP J

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JIMENEZ, VINCENTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORTEZ, KIMBERLY KATHLEEN

Defendant Attorneys

MOSHER, EDWARD JOSEPH

HAUGEN, SHANNON

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

6/21/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4236.1793 / 4535098) ( V )

2/26/2019: CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4236.1793 / 4535098) ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

11/20/2018: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

ORDER CORRECTING / MODIFYING CREDIT TIME SERVED ( V )

11/20/2018: ORDER CORRECTING / MODIFYING CREDIT TIME SERVED ( V )

COMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL ( V )

11/19/2018: COMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL ( V )

NOTICE OF FINES AND COST DUE ( V )

11/15/2018: NOTICE OF FINES AND COST DUE ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

11/15/2018: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

10/26/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

9/25/2018: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

9/11/2018: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ( V )

8/24/2018: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

8/20/2018: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

8/1/2018: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - INSUFFICIENT INFORMATION ( V )

7/31/2018: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - INSUFFICIENT INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

7/27/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

7/11/2018: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

6/25/2018: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

6/25/2018: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCASE PLACED WITH PENN CREDIT IN FILE penncredit_12192019.txt - BALANCE DUE $360.83.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED : PAY COSTS OR SETUP PAYMENT PLAN REQUIRED BY: 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED 09/19/2019 - FAILED TO PAY $360.83

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • HearingEvent: COLLECTION COURT HEARING; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Courtroom L - SC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketREOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketCASE REOPENED FOR COLLECTION COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketCOLLECTION COURT HEARING SET FOR 08/26/2019 AT 1:30 PM IN L/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: CORTEZ, KIMBERLY KATHLEEN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT - MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 07/26/2018 AT 9:00 AM IN 1D/ , COUNTY JUDGE: YACUCCI, PHILIP J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketSURETY BOND X60369427 POSTED $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE YACUCCI, PHILIP J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/25/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018MM001527 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CORTEZ, KIMBERLY KATHLEEN