This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/25/2020 at 19:47:30 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. JIMENEZ-NAVARRETE, OMAR MARCELO

Case Summary

On 04/16/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JIMENEZ-NAVARRETE, OMAR MARCELO. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********72 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JIMENEZ-NAVARRETE, OMAR MARCELO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOSELEY, AMBER

Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS, DAVID ALEXANDER

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION ( V )

6/6/2019: NO INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

5/29/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

5/16/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

EXTRADITION COST MEMO ( V )

5/14/2019: EXTRADITION COST MEMO ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

5/14/2019: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

5/14/2019: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

5/14/2019: WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: MOSELEY, AMBER ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: BATTERY ON ELDERLY PERSON (784.08.2B); Level: F; Degree: S; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: LEWIS, DAVID ALEXANDER ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXTRADITION COST MEMO ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $7500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 1905620183389

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE VAUGHN, DAN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/16/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018CF000972 A

    Read MoreRead Less