This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/24/2020 at 04:03:50 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. JENKINS, JASPER V

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JENKINS, JASPER V. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********90 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JENKINS, JASPER V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

Defendant Attorney

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO APPOINT EXPERT ( V )

10/21/2020: MOTION TO APPOINT EXPERT ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

10/13/2020: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

10/12/2020: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

10/12/2020: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

9/24/2020: CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

10/7/2020: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/7/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

10/5/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

CAPIAS - SIGNED BY JUDGE ( V )

10/1/2020: CAPIAS - SIGNED BY JUDGE ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

9/24/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

9/23/2020: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

9/4/2020: WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW/SET ASIDE (QUASH) WARRANT/CAPIAS ( V )

9/25/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW/SET ASIDE (QUASH) WARRANT/CAPIAS ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/9/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

9/8/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

9/8/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

9/8/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

9/8/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount; Code: PDAPP; Description: Public Defender Application; Assessment: $50.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT EXPERT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 12/08/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 19056202013608

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE HENDRIKS, JEFFREY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020MM001562 A

    Read MoreRead Less