Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 09:01:36 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. JAZO, RYAN PHILLIP

Case Summary

On 11/27/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JAZO, RYAN PHILLIP. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are STEELE, DARREN, YACUCCI, PHILIP J and ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********23 A

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

STEELE, DARREN

YACUCCI, PHILIP J

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JAZO, RYAN PHILLIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORTEZ, KIMBERLY KATHLEEN

Defendant Attorney

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

 

Court Documents

RETURN MAIL ( V )

3/12/2018: RETURN MAIL ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING

2/26/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4079.2984 / 4384538) ( V )

12/27/2017: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4079.2984 / 4384538) ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

12/22/2017: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

COMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL ( V )

12/19/2017: COMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL ( V )

NOTICE OF FINES AND COST DUE ( V )

12/14/2017: NOTICE OF FINES AND COST DUE ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

12/14/2017: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

INFORMATION ( V )

12/7/2017: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

12/1/2017: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/29/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

11/28/2017: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

11/27/2017: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

11/27/2017: NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

11/27/2017: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

11/25/2017: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCASE PLACED WITH PENN CREDIT IN FILE penncredit_08162018.txt - BALANCE DUE $398.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED : PAY COSTS OR SETUP PAYMENT PLAN REQUIRED BY: 04/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED 04/13/2018 - FAILED TO PAY $398.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • HearingEvent: COLLECTION COURT HEARING; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Courtroom L - SC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketREOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketCASE REOPENED FOR COLLECTION COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketCOLLECTION COURT HEARING SET FOR 04/09/2018 AT 1:30 PM IN L/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 12/14/2017 AT 9:00 AM IN 1D/ , COUNTY JUDGE: YACUCCI, PHILIP J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE YACUCCI, PHILIP J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/27/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017MM002923 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CORTEZ, KIMBERLY KATHLEEN